ID S1101 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Session Law Chapter 162 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Session Law Chapter 162 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
WATER -- Amends existing law to limit fees imposed for stock watering claims.
Title
Amends existing law to limit fees imposed for stock watering claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 162 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2017-03-21 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2017-03-16 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-16 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-16 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0 |
2017-03-15 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-14 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-08 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2017-03-08 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2017-03-07 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 32-1-2 |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |