ID S1018 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Take bill off General Orders; referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

STATE HISTORICAL SOCIETY -- Repeals and amends existing law to remove provisions relating to the State Historical Society.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals and amends existing law to remove provisions relating to the State Historical Society.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23HouseTake bill off General Orders; referred to State Affairs
2021-02-19HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2021-02-10HouseRead First Time, Referred to State Affairs
2021-02-10HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2021-02-09Senateto House
2021-02-09SenateTitle apvd
2021-02-09SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2021-02-02SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2021-02-01SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2021-01-21SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2021-01-20SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback