ID S1010 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Session Law Chapter 94 Effective: 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Session Law Chapter 94 Effective: 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TRANSPORTATION -- Amends existing law to allow a vehicle traveling slower than the normal speed of traffic to turn off at the next available location where it is safe and reasonable for the vehicle to pull over.
Title
Amends existing law to allow a vehicle traveling slower than the normal speed of traffic to turn off at the next available location where it is safe and reasonable for the vehicle to pull over.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 94 Effective: 07/01/2023 |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2023-03-17 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2023-03-15 | House | to Senate |
2023-03-15 | House | Title apvd |
2023-03-15 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1 |
2023-03-13 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-09 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2023-02-03 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2023-02-03 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2023-02-02 | Senate | to House |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Title apvd |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Transportation |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |