ID HR005 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HOUSE RULES -- Amends and adds to existing rules to redesignate the rule numbers of the Rules of the House of Representatives.
Title
Amends and adds to existing rules to redesignate the rule numbers of the Rules of the House of Representatives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2019-03-26 | House | Title apvd |
2019-03-26 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 66-0-4 |
2019-03-25 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-03-15 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |