ID HR003 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HOUSE RULE -- Stating findings of the House of Representatives and amending existing House Rule 41 regarding pairing.
Title
Stating findings of the House of Representatives and amending existing House Rule 41 regarding pairing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | House | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2019-03-06 | House | Title apvd |
2019-03-06 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 69-0-1 |
2019-03-05 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-04 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |