ID HJM001 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - Delivered to Secretary of State on 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - Delivered to Secretary of State on 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating findings of the Legislature and urging Congress to propose the Parental Rights Amendment to the states for ratification.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and urging Congress to propose the Parental Rights Amendment to the states for ratification.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-02-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Delivered to Secretary of State on 03/15 | |
2011-03-15 | To Secretary of State | |
2011-03-14 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-11 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-11 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-10 | To enrol | |
2011-03-09 | to House | |
2011-03-09 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-09 | Fulcher | |
2011-03-09 | voice vote Floor Sponsor | |
2011-03-09 | ADOPTED | |
2011-03-09 | 10th Ord | |
2011-03-08 | to 10th Ord | |
2011-03-08 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-08 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-08 | to St Aff | |
2011-02-08 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-08 | Senate intro | |
2011-02-07 | to Senate | |
2011-02-07 | Title apvd | |
2011-02-07 | Nonini & Moyle | |
2011-02-07 | 3rd rdg -- ADOPTED -- 49-20-1 AYES -- Anderson, Andrus, Barbieri, Bateman, Bayer, Bedke, Bell, Bilbao, Black, Block, Bolz, Boyle, Chadderdon(Chadderdon), Collins, Crane, DeMordaunt, Ellsworth, Eskridge, Gibbs(Wheeler), Guthrie, Hagedorn, Hart, Hartgen, Henderson, Lake, Luker, McGeachin, McMillan, Moyle, Nesset, Nonini, Palmer, Perry, Raybould, Roberts, Schaefer, Shepherd, Shirley, Simpson, Stevenson, Takasugi(Batt), Thayn, Thompson, Trail, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barrett, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Chew, Cronin, Harwood, Higgins, Jaquet, Killen, King, Lacey, Marriott, Nielsen, Patrick, Pence, Ringo, Rusche, Sims, Smith(30), Smith(24) Absent and excused -- Loertscher Floor Sponsors | |
2011-02-04 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-04 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-03 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-03 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-03 | Rpt out | |
2011-01-27 | to Educ | |
2011-01-27 | Rpt prt | |
2011-01-26 | to printing | |
2011-01-26 | 1st rdg | |
2011-01-26 | House intro |