ID HCR041 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 2:44 p.m. on March 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 2:44 p.m. on March 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
GROUP INSURANCE AND TOTAL COMPENSATION STUDY -- Stating findings of the Legislature and authorizing the Legislative Council to appoint a committee to continue a study of the State Employee Group Health Plan structure and to make recommendations.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and authorizing the Legislative Council to appoint a committee to continue a study of the State Employee Group Health Plan structure and to make recommendations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 2:44 p.m. on March 14, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2018-03-13 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2018-03-09 | Senate | to House |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED 33-0-2 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2018-02-22 | House | to Senate |
2018-02-22 | House | Title apvd |
2018-02-22 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 57-9-3 |
2018-02-21 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-20 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-19 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare |
2018-02-07 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |