ID H0669 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-04 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-04 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EQUALITY IN FINANCIAL SERVICES -- Adds to existing law to provide for equality in financial services.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide for equality in financial services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2024-03-01 | House | to Senate |
2024-03-01 | House | Title apvd |
2024-03-01 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 58-10-2 |
2024-02-29 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2024-02-28 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2024-02-27 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |