ID H0663 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
Pending: Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
Pending: Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PROPERTY TAXES -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding a property tax credit for certain plant and building investments.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding a property tax credit for certain plant and building investments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2022-02-28 | House | to Senate |
2022-02-28 | House | Title apvd |
2022-02-28 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 37-32-1 |
2022-02-25 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-02-24 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-02-18 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2022-02-17 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |