ID H0647 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-19 - to Loc Gov
Pending: Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-19 - to Loc Gov
Pending: Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to existing law to define terms, to prohibit a municipality or county from charging an incident response fee for the use of emergency services related to traffic incidents, to authorize a municipality or county to charge for certain actual expenses in traffic incidents, to provide for apportionment of actual expenses and to provide that established provisions shall not apply to certain charges.
Title
Adds to existing law to define terms, to prohibit a municipality or county from charging an incident response fee for the use of emergency services related to traffic incidents, to authorize a municipality or county to charge for certain actual expenses in traffic incidents, to provide for apportionment of actual expenses and to provide that established provisions shall not apply to certain charges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | to Loc Gov | |
2012-03-19 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-19 | Senate intro | |
2012-03-16 | to Senate | |
2012-03-16 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-16 | Perry | |
2012-03-16 | 54-7-9 AYES -- Andrus, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bayer, Bedke, Bell, Black, Bolz, Boyle, Buckner-Webb, Chadderdon, Chew, Collins, Crane, Cronin, DeMordaunt, Ellsworth, Eskridge, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Hart, Harwood, Jaquet, Killen, King, Lacey, Lake, Loertscher, Luker, Marriott, McGeachin, McMillan(McMillan), Moyle, Nesset, Nonini, Palmer, Patrick, Pence, Perry, Rusche, Schaefer, Shepherd, Simpson, Sims, Smith(30), Smith(24), Thayn, Thompson, Trail, Vander Woude, Wood(27), Wood(35), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Bilbao(Reynoldson), Higgins, Nielsen, Raybould, Ringo, Shirley, Wills Absent and excused -- Anderson, Barbieri, Block(Block), Burgoyne, Gibbs, Hartgen, Henderson, Roberts, Stevenson Floor Sponsor | |
2012-03-16 | PASSED | |
2012-03-16 | Rls susp | |
2012-03-16 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-16 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-15 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-15 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-15 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-12 | to Loc Gov | |
2012-03-12 | Rpt prt | |
2012-03-09 | to printing | |
2012-03-09 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-09 | House intro |