ID H0631 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MASK MANDATES -- Adds to existing law to establish provisions regarding the prohibition of mask mandates.
Title
Adds to existing law to establish provisions regarding the prohibition of mask mandates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2022-02-21 | House | to Senate |
2022-02-21 | House | Title apvd |
2022-02-21 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 46-24-0 |
2022-02-18 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 21, 2022 |
2022-02-17 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-02-16 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2022-02-15 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |