ID H0600 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-28 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2016 Session Law Chapter 255 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS - STATE APPELLATE PUBLIC DEFENDER - Appropriates $2,661,600 to the Office of the State Appellate Public Defender for fiscal year 2017; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 23; provides legislative intent for the payment of outside counsel costs; and provides legislative intent for the payment of capital representation costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $2,661,600 to the Office of the State Appellate Public Defender for fiscal year 2017; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 23; provides legislative intent for the payment of outside counsel costs; and provides legislative intent for the payment of capital representation costs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-28HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2016 Session Law Chapter 255 Effective: 07/01/2016
2016-03-25HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:36 p.m. on March 24, 2016
2016-03-24HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2016-03-23SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2016-03-23SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2016-03-22HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2016-03-22HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2016-03-21Senateto House
2016-03-21SenateTitle apvd
2016-03-21SenatePASSED -- 33-0-2
2016-03-21SenateRead third time in full
2016-03-17SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2016-03-16SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2016-03-16SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
2016-03-16SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2016-03-15Houseto Senate
2016-03-15HouseTitle apvd
2016-03-15HouseGannon
2016-03-15House55-12-3 AYES -- Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Bateman, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Chew, Clow, Collins, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hartgen, Horman, Jordan(Memmott), Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, McCrostie, McDonald, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nate, Nye, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rubel, Rudolph, Smith, Thompson, Troy, VanOrden, Wills, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barbieri, Batt, Crane, Harris, Hixon, Holtzclaw, McMillan, Nielsen, Scott, Sims, Trujillo, Vander Woude Absent -- Malek, Rusche, Shepherd Floor Sponsor
2016-03-15HousePASSED
2016-03-15HouseRules Suspended: Ayes 67 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 3, read three times
2016-03-15HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2016-03-14HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2016-03-11HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback