ID H0528 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 19, 2020 Session Law Chapter 216 Effective: 03/19/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 19, 2020 Session Law Chapter 216 Effective: 03/19/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FISH AND GAME -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the unlawful killing, possession, or waste of wildlife.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the unlawful killing, possession, or waste of wildlife.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-20 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 19, 2020 Session Law Chapter 216 Effective: 03/19/2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:40 p.m. on March 18, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2020-03-17 | Senate | to House |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 27-5-3 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-02-28 | House | to Senate |
2020-02-28 | House | Title apvd |
2020-02-28 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 45-16-9 |
2020-02-27 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-26 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-21 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2020-02-20 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |