ID H0528 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 23, 2016 Session Law Chapter 175 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 23, 2016 Session Law Chapter 175 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SEXUAL ASSAULT EVIDENCE KITS - Adds to existing law to provide that the Idaho State Police Forensic Services Laboratory shall test sexual assault evidence kits, to provide duties for health care facilities and local law enforcement, to provide procedures for testing kits, to provide for retention of kits, to provide for independent review of kits in certain instances, to provide for rules for a tracking process of kits, to provide that Idaho State Police Forensic Services shall provide kits to certain parties, to provide reporting and auditing requirements for untested kits, to provide for victim notification and to provide for reporting requirements.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide that the Idaho State Police Forensic Services Laboratory shall test sexual assault evidence kits, to provide duties for health care facilities and local law enforcement, to provide procedures for testing kits, to provide for retention of kits, to provide for independent review of kits in certain instances, to provide for rules for a tracking process of kits, to provide that Idaho State Police Forensic Services shall provide kits to certain parties, to provide reporting and auditing requirements for untested kits, to provide for victim notification and to provide for reporting requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 23, 2016 Session Law Chapter 175 Effective: 07/01/2016 |
2016-03-22 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:56 a.m. on March 21, 2016 |
2016-03-21 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2016-03-17 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2016-03-16 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2016-03-15 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-15 | Senate | PASSED -- 35-0-0 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2016-03-02 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-02 | House | PASSED -- 70-0-0 |
2016-03-02 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-03-01 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-29 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-26 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-02-24 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules, & Administration |
2016-02-23 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |