ID H0508 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 136 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 136 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to existing law relating to crime victims compensation to provide for payments to medical providers.
Title
Adds to existing law relating to crime victims compensation to provide for payments to medical providers.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 136 Effective: 07/01/10 | |
2010-03-24 | To Governor | |
2010-03-23 | Pres signed | |
2010-03-22 | Sp signed | |
2010-03-22 | Rpt enrol | |
2010-03-19 | To enrol | |
2010-03-18 | to House | |
2010-03-18 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-18 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2010-03-17 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-17 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-16 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-16 | rec d/p | |
2010-03-16 | Rpt out | |
2010-03-02 | to Jud | |
2010-03-02 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-02 | Senate intro | |
2010-03-01 | to Senate | |
2010-03-01 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-01 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 68-1-1 | |
2010-02-25 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-02-25 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-24 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-24 | rec d/p | |
2010-02-24 | Rpt out | |
2010-02-11 | to Com/HuRes | |
2010-02-11 | Rpt prt | |
2010-02-10 | to printing | |
2010-02-10 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-10 | House intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0508.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0508.pdf |