ID H0496 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPOINTMENT OF AGENCY DIRECTORS -- Amends existing law to provide that the Governor shall appoint the directors of the Department of Correction, the Idaho Transportation Department and the Department of Parks and Recreation, all of whom shall serve at the pleasure of the Governor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide that the Governor shall appoint the directors of the Department of Correction, the Idaho Transportation Department and the Department of Parks and Recreation, all of whom shall serve at the pleasure of the Governor.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-14HouseU.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee
2018-03-07HouseRetained on General Orders
2018-02-23HouseRetained on General Orders
2018-02-21HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2018-02-07HouseReferred to State Affairs
2018-02-07HouseReported out of Committee, Returned to the Desk for re-referral
2018-02-06HouseReported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare
2018-02-05HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback