ID H0436 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH -- Amends existing law to provide for the administration and maintenance of the Health Care Directive Registry by the Department of Health and Welfare.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for the administration and maintenance of the Health Care Directive Registry by the Department of Health and Welfare.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2020-02-26 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- FAILED 30-38-2 |
2020-02-25 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-02-24 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-21 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare |
2020-02-06 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |