ID H0418 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 31 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 31 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to the Public Employee Retirement System to revise a definition.
Title
Amends existing law relating to the Public Employee Retirement System to revise a definition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 31 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-01 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 02/29 | |
2012-02-29 | To Governor | |
2012-02-28 | Pres signed | |
2012-02-27 | Sp signed | |
2012-02-27 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-02-24 | To enrol | |
2012-02-23 | to House | |
2012-02-23 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-23 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 20-12-2 | |
2012-02-16 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-16 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-15 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-15 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-15 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-10 | to Com/HuRes | |
2012-02-10 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-10 | Senate intro | |
2012-02-06 | to Senate | |
2012-02-06 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-06 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 70-0-0 | |
2012-02-02 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-02 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-01 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-01 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-01 | Rpt out | |
2012-01-27 | to Com/HuRes | |
2012-01-27 | Rpt prt | |
2012-01-26 | to printing | |
2012-01-26 | 1st rdg | |
2012-01-26 | House intro |