ID H0404 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 14, 2018 Session Law Chapter 85 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

STATE TREASURER -- Amends existing law to provide a date change for reports by the Credit Rating Enhancement Committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide a date change for reports by the Credit Rating Enhancement Committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-14HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 14, 2018 Session Law Chapter 85 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-12HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:25 a.m. on March 9, 2018
2018-03-09HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-08SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-08SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-08HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-07HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-06Senateto House
2018-03-06SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-06SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2018-02-22SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-02-21SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2018-02-12SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-02-09Houseto Senate
2018-02-09HouseTitle apvd
2018-02-09HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-0-2
2018-02-07HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Friday, February 9, 2018
2018-02-06HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-05HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-01-26HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2018-01-25HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback