ID H0403 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

STATE TREASURER -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding additional allowable investments by the State Treasurer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding additional allowable investments by the State Treasurer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2018-02-12SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-02-09Houseto Senate
2018-02-09HouseTitle apvd
2018-02-09HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-0-2
2018-02-07HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Friday, February 9, 2018
2018-02-06HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-05HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-01-26HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2018-01-25HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback