ID H0386 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-15 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 44 Effective: 01/01/08 Section 1; 01/01/10 Sections 2 & 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-15 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 44 Effective: 01/01/08 Section 1; 01/01/10 Sections 2 & 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to revise how withdrawals from the state college savings account are added to taxable income; to revise the income tax credit for research activity; and to provide that the additional income tax credit for capital investment shall be calculated on the amount of qualified investment made during the project period wherever located within this state.
Title
Amends existing law to revise how withdrawals from the state college savings account are added to taxable income; to revise the income tax credit for research activity; and to provide that the additional income tax credit for capital investment shall be calculated on the amount of qualified investment made during the project period wherever located within this state.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 44 Effective: 01/01/08 Section 1; 01/01/10 Sections 2 & 3 | |
2010-03-12 | To Governor | |
2010-03-11 | Pres signed | |
2010-03-10 | Sp signed | |
2010-03-10 | Rpt enrol | |
2010-03-09 | To enrol | |
2010-03-08 | to House | |
2010-03-08 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-08 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 33-0-2 | |
2010-02-19 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-02-19 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-18 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-18 | rec d/p | |
2010-02-18 | Rpt out | |
2010-02-12 | to Loc Gov | |
2010-02-12 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-12 | Senate intro | |
2010-02-11 | to Senate | |
2010-02-11 | Title apvd | |
2010-02-11 | 3rd rdg as amen -- PASSED -- 65-0-5 | |
2010-02-08 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2010-02-08 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-05 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2010-02-05 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-05 | Rpt engros | |
2010-02-04 | to engros | |
2010-02-04 | Rpt out amen | |
2010-01-21 | to Gen Ord | |
2010-01-21 | Rpt out | |
2010-01-19 | to Rev/Tax | |
2010-01-19 | Rpt prt | |
2010-01-18 | to printing | |
2010-01-18 | 1st rdg | |
2010-01-18 | House intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0386.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0386.pdf |