ID H0309 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-08 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 273 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-08 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 273 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transfers $8,500 from the Miscellaneous Revenue Fund to the Small Business Assistance Fund; transfers $11,500 from the Business and Jobs Development Fund to the Small Business Assistance Fund; and appropriates an additional $50,000 in dedicated spending authority to the Department of Commerce for fiscal year 2012.
Title
Transfers $8,500 from the Miscellaneous Revenue Fund to the Small Business Assistance Fund; transfers $11,500 from the Business and Jobs Development Fund to the Small Business Assistance Fund; and appropriates an additional $50,000 in dedicated spending authority to the Department of Commerce for fiscal year 2012.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-08 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 273 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-04-07 | Delivered to Governor on 04/06 | |
2011-04-06 | To Governor | |
2011-04-05 | Pres signed | |
2011-04-05 | Sp signed | |
2011-04-05 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-04-04 | To enrol | |
2011-04-04 | to House | |
2011-04-04 | Title apvd | |
2011-04-04 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2011-04-01 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-04-01 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-31 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-31 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-31 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-30 | to Fin | |
2011-03-30 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-30 | Senate intro | |
2011-03-30 | to Senate | |
2011-03-30 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-30 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 65-3-2 | |
2011-03-29 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-29 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-28 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-28 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-25 | to printing | |
2011-03-25 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-25 | House intro |