ID H0299 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-08 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 258 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-08 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 258 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to delete language relating to certain final adverse benefit determinations and to provide an opt-in election for single employer self-funded benefit plans subject to and operated in compliance with the Federal Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974.
Title
Amends existing law to delete language relating to certain final adverse benefit determinations and to provide an opt-in election for single employer self-funded benefit plans subject to and operated in compliance with the Federal Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-08 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 258 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-04-07 | Delivered to Governor on 04/07 | |
2011-04-07 | To Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Pres signed | |
2011-04-06 | Sp signed | |
2011-04-06 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-04-05 | To enrol | |
2011-04-04 | to House | |
2011-04-04 | Title apvd | |
2011-04-04 | Cameron | |
2011-04-04 | 35-0-0 AYES -- Andreason, Bair, Bilyeu, Bock, Brackett, Broadsword, Cameron, Corder, Darrington, Davis, Fulcher, Goedde, Hammond, Heider, Hill, Keough, LeFavour, Lodge, Malepeai, McGee, McKague, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nuxoll, Pearce, Schmidt, Siddoway, Smyser, Stegner, Stennett, Tippets, Toryanski, Vick, Werk, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor | |
2011-04-04 | PASSED | |
2011-04-04 | Rls susp | |
2011-04-04 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-04-04 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-04-01 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-04-01 | rec d/p | |
2011-04-01 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-30 | to Com/HuRes | |
2011-03-30 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-30 | Senate intro | |
2011-03-30 | to Senate | |
2011-03-30 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-30 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 62-0-8 | |
2011-03-29 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-29 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-28 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-28 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-28 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-22 | to Bus | |
2011-03-22 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-21 | to printing | |
2011-03-21 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-21 | House intro |