ID H0245 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2023 Session Law Chapter 139 Effective: 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2023 Session Law Chapter 139 Effective: 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- Amends existing law to increase the distribution of cigarette and tobacco product taxes to the Central Cancer Registry Fund.
Title
Amends existing law to increase the distribution of cigarette and tobacco product taxes to the Central Cancer Registry Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2023 Session Law Chapter 139 Effective: 07/01/2023 |
2023-03-23 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11 a.m. on March 23, 2023 |
2023-03-23 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2023-03-22 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2023-03-21 | Senate | to House |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Title apvd |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-1-0 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2023-03-08 | House | to Senate |
2023-03-08 | House | Title apvd |
2023-03-08 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2023-03-08 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2023-03-02 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2023-03-01 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |