ID H0242 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2023 Session Law Chapter 310 Effective: 05/05/2023 (30 days after passage and approval)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2023 Session Law Chapter 310 Effective: 05/05/2023 (30 days after passage and approval)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
ABORTION -- Amends and adds to existing law to provide for the crime of abortion trafficking, to provide certain requirements for and restrictions on a civil action, and to provide prosecution authority for the attorney general.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law to provide for the crime of abortion trafficking, to provide certain requirements for and restrictions on a civil action, and to provide prosecution authority for the attorney general.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2023 Session Law Chapter 310 Effective: 05/05/2023 (30 days after passage and approval) |
2023-03-31 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:40 a.m. on March 31, 2023 |
2023-03-31 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2023-03-30 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2023-03-30 | House | to enrol |
2023-03-30 | House | Title apvd |
2023-03-30 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2023-03-30 | House | Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2023-03-30 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2023-03-30 | House | Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2023-03-30 | House | House Concurred in Senate Amendments |
2023-03-30 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended; Held at Desk |
2023-03-30 | Senate | to House |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Title apvd |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Read in full as required) -- PASSED 27-7-1 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2023-03-07 | House | to Senate |
2023-03-07 | House | Title apvd |
2023-03-07 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2023-03-07 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-03 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2023-03-01 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2023-02-28 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |