ID H0236 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - U.C. to be returned to Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - U.C. to be returned to Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EMERGENCIES -- Adds to existing law to provide for first informer broadcasters in the Idaho Emergency Operations Plan and to provide for training.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide for first informer broadcasters in the Idaho Emergency Operations Plan and to provide for training.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | House | U.C. to be returned to Education Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | U.C. to be placed on General Orders |
2017-03-06 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Environment, Energy & Technology |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2017/legislation/H0236/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2017/legislation/H0236.pdf |