ID H0148 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

MOTOR VEHICLES -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding an administrative hearing on a license suspension.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding an administrative hearing on a license suspension.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
2021-03-02SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2021-03-01Houseto Senate
2021-03-01HouseTitle apvd
2021-03-01HousePreviously Read in Full -- PASSED 68-1-1
2021-03-01HouseRead Third Time in Full
2021-02-26HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 1, 2021
2021-02-25HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2021-02-25HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2021-02-24HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2021-02-15HouseReported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2021-02-12HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback