ID H0142 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 31, 2023 Session Law Chapter 238 Effective: 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 31, 2023 Session Law Chapter 238 Effective: 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
SCRAP DEALERS -- Amends existing law to provide for catalytic converters and certain valuable metals.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for catalytic converters and certain valuable metals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 31, 2023 Session Law Chapter 238 Effective: 07/01/2023 |
2023-03-30 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:35 a.m. on March 30, 2023 |
2023-03-30 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2023-03-29 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2023-03-29 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2023-03-28 | Senate | to House |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Title apvd |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 29-4-2 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2023-03-20 | House | to Senate |
2023-03-20 | House | Title apvd |
2023-03-20 | House | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 63-6-1 |
2023-03-17 | House | Read second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-16 | House | Read first time as amended; filed for Second Reading |
2023-03-16 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2023-03-15 | House | Bill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2023-03-15 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2023-03-15 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-28 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2023-02-15 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Business |
2023-02-14 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |