ID H0129 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - Returned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

DIETITIANS -- Repeals, amends and adds to existing law to revise licensing and other provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals, amends and adds to existing law to revise licensing and other provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 8 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-14HouseReturned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
2017-03-13SenateRet’d to House
2017-03-13SenateRead third time in full -- FAILED 8-25-2
2017-03-03SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2017-03-02SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2017-02-23SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
2017-02-23SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2017-02-22Houseto Senate
2017-02-22HouseTitle apvd
2017-02-22HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 44-23-3
2017-02-21HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2017-02-20HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2017-02-17HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2017-02-10HouseReported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare
2017-02-09HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback