ID H0106 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-20 - Returned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-20 - Returned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
RESIDENTIAL SCHOOLS -- Amends existing law to require accredited residential schools to make reports required by the Department of Education and to retain them under the jurisdiction of the Department of Health and Welfare.
Title
Amends existing law to require accredited residential schools to make reports required by the Department of Education and to retain them under the jurisdiction of the Department of Health and Welfare.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | House | Returned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Ret’d to House |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Read third time in full -- FAILED 14-20-1 -Webb |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Education |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-03-01 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-01 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-01 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 49-21-0 |
2017-02-28 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-27 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill Previously Held at Desk, Referred to Education |
2017-02-06 | House | Reported Printed and Held at Desk |
2017-02-03 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |