ID H0074 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 23, 2023 Session Law Chapter 124 Effective: 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 23, 2023 Session Law Chapter 124 Effective: 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
OCCUPATIONAL LICENSING -- Amends and adds to existing law to provide for attorney licensure by the Idaho Supreme Court, to prohibit additional methods of demonstrating competency to qualify for universal licensure, to provide for conditional licensure under certain conditions, and to provide for universal work recognition.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law to provide for attorney licensure by the Idaho Supreme Court, to prohibit additional methods of demonstrating competency to qualify for universal licensure, to provide for conditional licensure under certain conditions, and to provide for universal work recognition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 23, 2023 Session Law Chapter 124 Effective: 07/01/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:20 p.m. on March 20, 2023 |
2023-03-20 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2023-03-17 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2023-03-16 | House | to enrol |
2023-03-16 | House | Title apvd |
2023-03-16 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2023-03-16 | House | Read second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-15 | House | Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2023-03-15 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2023-03-14 | House | Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2023-03-14 | House | House Concurred in Senate Amendments |
2023-03-14 | House | Reported out of Committee and Recommend Concurrence |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred to Business for concurrence recommendation |
2023-03-13 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended |
2023-03-09 | Senate | to House |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Title apvd |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2023-02-15 | House | to Senate |
2023-02-15 | House | Title apvd |
2023-02-15 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 65-4-1 |
2023-02-14 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2023-02-13 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2023-02-10 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2023-02-03 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Business |
2023-02-02 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |