ID H0002 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 8, 2019 Session Law Chapter 64 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

LOGGING -- Amends existing law to provide that the director of the Idaho State Police and the Idaho Transportation Board shall have authority to perform safety inspections and safety training programs, issue certain orders, and enforce certain rules if a logging truck is operating on public highways; and to provide that logging trucks are subject to certain administrative rules if transporting on public highways.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide that the director of the Idaho State Police and the Idaho Transportation Board shall have authority to perform safety inspections and safety training programs, issue certain orders, and enforce certain rules if a logging truck is operating on public highways; and to provide that logging trucks are subject to certain administrative rules if transporting on public highways.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 8, 2019 Session Law Chapter 64 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-11HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:45 a.m. on March 8, 2019
2019-03-08HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-03-07SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-03-07SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-03-06HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-04Houseto enrol
2019-03-04HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-04HouseRead third time in full as amended in Senate -- PASSED 65-2-3
2019-03-01HouseRead second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-28HouseRead first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-28HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2019-02-27HouseBills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2019-02-27HouseHouse Concurred in Senate Amendments
2019-02-27HouseReported out of Committee and Recommend Concurrence
2019-02-26HouseReferred to Transportation & Defense for concurrence recommendation
2019-02-26HouseReturned from the Senate Amended
2019-02-25Senateto House
2019-02-25SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-25SenateRead third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 35-0-0
2019-02-15SenateRead second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading
2019-02-14SenateRead first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-14SenateAmendments reported printed
2019-02-13SenateReported out as amended; filed for first reading
2019-02-13SenateAmendments ordered printed
2019-02-13SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2019-02-01SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation
2019-01-29SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-01-28Houseto Senate
2019-01-28HouseTitle apvd
2019-01-28HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0
2019-01-25HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, January 28, 2019
2019-01-24HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-01-23HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-01-15HouseReported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback