ID H0002 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 8, 2019 Session Law Chapter 64 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 8, 2019 Session Law Chapter 64 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
LOGGING -- Amends existing law to provide that the director of the Idaho State Police and the Idaho Transportation Board shall have authority to perform safety inspections and safety training programs, issue certain orders, and enforce certain rules if a logging truck is operating on public highways; and to provide that logging trucks are subject to certain administrative rules if transporting on public highways.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that the director of the Idaho State Police and the Idaho Transportation Board shall have authority to perform safety inspections and safety training programs, issue certain orders, and enforce certain rules if a logging truck is operating on public highways; and to provide that logging trucks are subject to certain administrative rules if transporting on public highways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 8, 2019 Session Law Chapter 64 Effective: 07/01/2019 |
2019-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:45 a.m. on March 8, 2019 |
2019-03-08 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2019-03-06 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | to enrol |
2019-03-04 | House | Title apvd |
2019-03-04 | House | Read third time in full as amended in Senate -- PASSED 65-2-3 |
2019-03-01 | House | Read second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-28 | House | Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2019-02-27 | House | Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2019-02-27 | House | House Concurred in Senate Amendments |
2019-02-27 | House | Reported out of Committee and Recommend Concurrence |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to Transportation & Defense for concurrence recommendation |
2019-02-26 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended |
2019-02-25 | Senate | to House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2019-01-28 | House | to Senate |
2019-01-28 | House | Title apvd |
2019-01-28 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0 |
2019-01-25 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, January 28, 2019 |
2019-01-24 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-01-23 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-01-15 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |