IA SSB3173 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2375.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2375.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the powers, duties, and responsibilities of state government entities associated with the budget, financial control, and information technology, making penalties applicable, and making appropriations.(See SF 2375, SF 2409.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the powers, duties, and responsibilities of state government entities associated with the budget, financial control, and information technology, making penalties applicable, and making appropriations.(See SF 2375, SF 2409.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2375. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2024 1:00PM Room G15. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: Bousselot, Celsi, and Kraayenbrink. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HSB695 (Related) 2024-02-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2622.
SF2375 (Replaced by) 2024-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2409. S.J. 466.
HF2622 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 891.
SF2409 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 948.
HF2708 (Replaced by) 2024-05-21 - NOBA: Final
SF2375 (Replaced by) 2024-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2409. S.J. 466.
HF2622 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 891.
SF2409 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 948.
HF2708 (Replaced by) 2024-05-21 - NOBA: Final
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3173 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3173.html |