IA SSB3173 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2364
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2329
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2329
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2018 1:30PM RM 315
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2018 1:30PM RM 315
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to health benefit plans for members of certain agricultural organizations.
Title
A bill for an act relating to health benefit plans for members of certain agricultural organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2018 1:30PM RM 315 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee: Feenstra, Zumbach, and Allen. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
HF2364 (Replaced by) 2018-03-21 - Fiscal note.
SF2329 (Replaced by) 2018-03-15 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 592.
HSB637 (Related) 2018-02-13 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 263.
SF2329 (Replaced by) 2018-03-15 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 592.
HSB637 (Related) 2018-02-13 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 263.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB3173 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB3173.html |