IA SF2329 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 592.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 592.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to health benefit plans for members of certain agricultural organizations. (Formerly SSB 3173.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to health benefit plans for members of certain agricultural organizations. (Formerly SSB 3173.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 592. |
2018-03-12 | House | Amendment H-8250 filed. H.J. 568. |
2018-03-09 | House | Amendments H-8247, H-8248 and H-8249 filed. H.J. 553. |
2018-03-09 | House | Amendments H-8243, H-8244, H-8245 and H-8246 filed. H.J. 552. |
2018-03-09 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 551. |
2018-03-07 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 513. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 588. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 40, nays 9. S.J. 580. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 350. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 344. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB637 (Related) 2018-02-13 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 263.
SSB3173 (Related) 2018-02-12 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2018 1:30PM RM 315
HF2364 (Similar To) 2018-03-21 - Fiscal note.
SSB3173 (Related) 2018-02-12 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2018 1:30PM RM 315
HF2364 (Similar To) 2018-03-21 - Fiscal note.