IA SSB3126 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SJR2003
Note: Legislation replaced by SJR2004
Note: Legislation replaced by SJR2004
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Voted - Natural Resources and Environment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Voted - Natural Resources and Environment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for a Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa providing that the people of the state have a right to hunt, fish, and harvest wildlife.
Title
A study bill for a Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa providing that the people of the state have a right to hunt, fish, and harvest wildlife.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | Senate | Voted - Natural Resources and Environment. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | 12:00PM; Senate Lobbyist Lounge Natural Resources and Environment. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Natural Resources and Environment: Dearden Chair,Brase, and Shipley. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | In Natural Resources and Environment |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SJR2003 (Replaced by) 2016-01-26 - Introduced, referred to Rules & Administration. S.J. 102.
SJR2004 (Replaced by) 2016-03-10 - Referred to Natural Resources and Environment. S.J. 471.
SJR2004 (Replaced by) 2016-03-10 - Referred to Natural Resources and Environment. S.J. 471.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SSB3126 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/SSB3126.html |