IA SSB3122 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2345
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2539
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2539
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2345.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2345.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the newborn screening.(See SF 2345.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the newborn screening.(See SF 2345.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2345. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/10/2022 2:00PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee: Costello, Green, and Trone Garriott. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
HSB690 (Related) 2022-02-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2539.
SF2345 (Replaced by) 2022-06-30 - Fiscal note.
HF2539 (Replaced by) 2022-03-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 542.
SF2345 (Replaced by) 2022-06-30 - Fiscal note.
HF2539 (Replaced by) 2022-03-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 542.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB3122 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB3122.html |