IA SF2345 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the newborn screening. (Formerly SSB 3122.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the newborn screening. (Formerly SSB 3122.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Human Resources Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Human Resources Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 814. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 803. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 498. |
2022-03-10 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 542. |
2022-03-10 | House | Passed House, yeas 92, nays 0. H.J. 522. |
2022-03-10 | House | Substituted for HF 2539. H.J. 521. |
2022-03-09 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 512. |
2022-03-08 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 507. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 463. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 463. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 352. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 344. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3122 (Related) 2022-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2345.
HSB690 (Related) 2022-02-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2539.
HF2539 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 542.
HSB690 (Related) 2022-02-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2539.
HF2539 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 542.