IA SSB3109 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2534
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/11/2020 2:30PM RM 24.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/11/2020 2:30PM RM 24.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the applicability of beverage container control provisions, handling fees, and acceptance of beverage containers, making penalties applicable, and providing effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the applicability of beverage container control provisions, handling fees, and acceptance of beverage containers, making penalties applicable, and providing effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/11/2020 2:30PM RM 24. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Bisignano, and Brown. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Commerce. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
HSB507 (Related) 2020-02-21 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 330.
HF2534 (Replaced by) 2020-02-25 - Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Hein and Isenhart. H.J. 369.
HF2534 (Replaced by) 2020-02-25 - Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Hein and Isenhart. H.J. 369.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB3109 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB3109.html |