IA HSB507 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF2534

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 330.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the applicability of beverage container control provisions, handling fees, and acceptance of beverage containers, making penalties applicable, and providing effective date provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the applicability of beverage container control provisions, handling fees, and acceptance of beverage containers, making penalties applicable, and providing effective date provisions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-21HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 330.
2020-02-18HouseSubcommittee recommends passage.
2020-02-17HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/18/2020 7:30AM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult.
2020-01-17HouseSubcommittee: Bossman, Sexton, Moore, T., Lensing and Derry. H.J. 110.
2020-01-16HouseIntroduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 95.
2020-01-16HouseBy COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

SSB3109 (Related) 2020-02-06 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/11/2020 2:30PM RM 24.
HF2534 (Replaced by) 2020-02-25 - Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Hein and Isenhart. H.J. 369.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback