IA SSB3054 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2314
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2246
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2246
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2246.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2246.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to support of interlibrary loan programs by the department of administrative services under the enrich Iowa program.(See SF 2246.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to support of interlibrary loan programs by the department of administrative services under the enrich Iowa program.(See SF 2246.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2246. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2024 10:30AM Senate Lounge. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Bousselot, and Winckler. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HSB583 (Related) 2024-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2314.
HF2314 (Replaced by) 2024-02-05 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 193.
SF2246 (Replaced by) 2024-03-14 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 536.
HF2314 (Replaced by) 2024-02-05 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 193.
SF2246 (Replaced by) 2024-03-14 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 536.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3054 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3054.html |