IA HSB583 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2314
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2246
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2246
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2314.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2314.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to support of interlibrary loan programs by the department of administrative services under the enrich Iowa program.(See HF 2314.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to support of interlibrary loan programs by the department of administrative services under the enrich Iowa program.(See HF 2314.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2314. |
2024-01-31 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 175. |
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-01-22 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2024 2:30PM House Lounge. |
2024-01-18 | House | Subcommittee: Bergan, Matson and Wulf. H.J. 110. |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 108. |
2024-01-18 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3054 (Related) 2024-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2246.
HF2314 (Replaced by) 2024-02-05 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 193.
SF2246 (Replaced by) 2024-03-14 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 536.
HF2314 (Replaced by) 2024-02-05 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 193.
SF2246 (Replaced by) 2024-03-14 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 536.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB583 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB583.html |