IA SSB3012 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2213
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2196
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2196
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2196.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2196.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act extending the repeal date of the Iowa cell siting Act and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act extending the repeal date of the Iowa cell siting Act and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2196. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2020 10:30AM RM G17. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Brown, Lykam, and Nunn. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
HSB516 (Related) 2020-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage. H.J. 166.
HF2213 (Replaced by) 2020-03-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 513.
SF2196 (Replaced by) 2020-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 658.
HF2213 (Replaced by) 2020-03-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 513.
SF2196 (Replaced by) 2020-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 658.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB3012 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB3012.html |