IA SF2196 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 658.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 658.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act extending the repeal date of the Iowa cell siting Act and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3012.) Effective date: 06/01/2020.
Title
A bill for an act extending the repeal date of the Iowa cell siting Act and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3012.) Effective date: 06/01/2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - Passed House (Y: 81 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 658. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 658. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 540. |
2020-03-05 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 513. |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed House, yeas 81, nays 14. H.J. 498. |
2020-03-05 | House | Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken. H.J. 498. |
2020-03-05 | House | Substituted for HF 2213. H.J. 498. |
2020-02-25 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 356. |
2020-02-24 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 337. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 386. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0. S.J. 384. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 261. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 254. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3012 (Related) 2020-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2196.
HSB516 (Related) 2020-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage. H.J. 166.
HF2213 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 513.
HSB516 (Related) 2020-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage. H.J. 166.
HF2213 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 513.