IA SSB3002 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2397.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2397.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the taxation of captive companies, and including effective date provisions.(See SF 2397.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the taxation of captive companies, and including effective date provisions.(See SF 2397.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2397. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2024 2:30PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Subcommittee: Bousselot, Petersen, and Rowley. |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. |
2024-01-09 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
HSB535 (Related) 2024-01-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2121.
HF2121 (Replaced by) 2024-03-20 - Withdrawn. H.J. 633.
SF2397 (Replaced by) 2024-04-09 - Withdrawn. S.J. 772.
HF2636 (Replaced by) 2024-05-08 - Fiscal note.
HF2121 (Replaced by) 2024-03-20 - Withdrawn. H.J. 633.
SF2397 (Replaced by) 2024-04-09 - Withdrawn. S.J. 772.
HF2636 (Replaced by) 2024-05-08 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3002 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3002.html |