IA SF2397 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-09 - Withdrawn. S.J. 772.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-09 - Withdrawn. S.J. 772.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the taxation of captive companies, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 3002.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the taxation of captive companies, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 3002.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 772. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | HF 2636 substituted. S.J. 772. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Attached to HF 2636. S.J. 593. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 373. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 372. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3002 (Related) 2024-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2397.
HSB535 (Related) 2024-01-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2121.
HF2121 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Withdrawn. H.J. 633.
HF2636 (Similar To) 2024-05-08 - Fiscal note.
HSB535 (Related) 2024-01-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2121.
HF2121 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Withdrawn. H.J. 633.
HF2636 (Similar To) 2024-05-08 - Fiscal note.