IA SSB1149 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF424
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 424.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 424.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the licensure of persons completing an apprenticeship, and including effective date provisions.(See SF 424.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the licensure of persons completing an apprenticeship, and including effective date provisions.(See SF 424.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 424. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/11/2021 10:00AM RM 24A. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Koelker, Bisignano, and Brown. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Subcommittee: Koelker, Bisignano, and Cournoyer. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SF424 (Replaced by) 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1150.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1149 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1149.html |