IA SF424 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1150.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the licensure of persons completing an apprenticeship, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1149.) Effective date: 01/01/2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the licensure of persons completing an apprenticeship, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1149.) Effective date: 01/01/2022.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20HouseSigned by Governor. S.J. 1150.
2021-05-20HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1149.
2021-04-13HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 941.
2021-04-13SenateImmediate message. S.J. 865.
2021-04-13SenatePassed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0. S.J. 859.
2021-04-13SenateSenate concurred with S-3132. S.J. 858.
2021-04-06SenateMessage from House, with amendment S-3132. S.J. 764.
2021-04-06HouseImmediate message. H.J. 894.
2021-05-18HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1172.
2021-04-21HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 996.
2021-04-13HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 951.
2021-04-06HousePassed House, yeas 90 nays none. H.J. 893.
2021-04-06HouseCommittee amendment H-1289 adopted. H.J. 893.
2021-03-24HouseCommittee amendment H-1289 filed. H.J. 833.
2021-03-24HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 831.
2021-03-16HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 03/17/2021 8:00AM Law Library.
2021-03-15HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 03/16/2021 12:00PM House Lounge.
2021-03-10HouseSubcommittee: Jones, Bloomingdale and Gjerde. H.J. 700.
2021-03-08HouseRead first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 644.
2021-03-08HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 643.
2021-03-08SenateImmediate message. S.J. 538.
2021-03-08SenatePassed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 537.
2021-02-18SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 408.
2021-02-18SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 404.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1149 (Related) 2021-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 424.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback