IA SSB1107 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF433
Note: Legislation replaced by SF440
Note: Legislation replaced by SF440
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 440.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 440.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to court reporters, including the reporting of adoption hearings and uncertified shorthand reporter appointments.(See SF 440.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to court reporters, including the reporting of adoption hearings and uncertified shorthand reporter appointments.(See SF 440.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 440. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2021 12:00PM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Subcommittee: Johnson, Boulton, and Garrett. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HSB78 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 300.
HF433 (Replaced by) 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1038.
SF440 (Replaced by) 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 823.
HF433 (Replaced by) 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1038.
SF440 (Replaced by) 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 823.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1107 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1107.html |